Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 06/26/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 06/26/2007
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 06/26/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL]* 06/26/2007
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 06/26/2007
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 06/26/2007
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 06/26/2007
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 06/26/2007
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 06/26/2007
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 08/01/2007
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 09/04/2007
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 11/01/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/05/2008
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 04/08/2008
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 04/17/2008
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 09/24/2008