Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 06/21/2007
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/26/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 08/01/2007
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 09/24/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/05/2008
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/10/2008
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 03/13/2008
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 04/07/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 04/23/2008
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 04/28/2008