Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 06/13/2007
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 06/13/2007
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 06/13/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL]* 06/13/2007
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 06/19/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 09/25/2007
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/23/2007
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 12/03/2007