Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 06/13/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 06/13/2007
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 06/13/2007
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/26/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 06/26/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 06/28/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/09/2007
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/10/2007
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/11/2007
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 07/17/2007
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 07/20/2007
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 08/01/2007
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 08/02/2007