Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 06/07/2007
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 06/07/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 06/07/2007
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 06/07/2007
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 06/07/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 06/07/2007
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/13/2007
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 06/14/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/17/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 07/17/2007
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 07/31/2007
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 08/01/2007
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 10/01/2007
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 12/18/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 02/12/2008
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 07/17/2008