Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 05/24/2007
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 05/24/2007
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 05/24/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 05/24/2007
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 05/24/2007
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 05/24/2007
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 05/24/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 05/24/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 05/24/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 05/24/2007
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/25/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/06/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 06/14/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/21/2007
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/21/2007
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/25/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/25/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/25/2007
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/25/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 07/09/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 07/09/2007
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 07/09/2007
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 07/10/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 07/10/2007
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 07/18/2007
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 07/19/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/19/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 07/20/2007
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 07/25/2007
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 09/07/2007
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 09/20/2007
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 09/25/2007
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 09/27/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 10/01/2007
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/02/2007
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 10/16/2007
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 10/16/2007
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 10/16/2007
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 10/16/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 10/16/2007
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 10/17/2007
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 11/08/2007
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 11/14/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 02/25/2008
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 02/26/2008
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 03/03/2008
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 04/14/2008