Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 05/10/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/05/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/27/2007
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 06/28/2007
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 07/12/2007