Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 04/18/2007
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 04/18/2007
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 05/01/2007
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 05/08/2007
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/18/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/19/2007
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 09/11/2007