Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/04/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/04/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/04/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/04/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 03/04/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/04/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/04/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/04/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/04/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/05/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 03/05/2008
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 03/05/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/10/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/10/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/10/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/11/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/11/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/13/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/14/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/14/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/14/2008
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/01/2008
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/01/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/17/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/30/2008

Show cosponsors who withdrew