Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 02/07/2008
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 02/07/2008
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 02/07/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 02/07/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 02/07/2008
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/12/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/12/2008
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/12/2008
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/12/2008
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/08/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/08/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/08/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 06/11/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/17/2008
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 06/17/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/17/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/17/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/17/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/17/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 06/19/2008
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 06/19/2008
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/19/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/19/2008
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/19/2008
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/19/2008
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/19/2008
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/19/2008
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/19/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 06/19/2008
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/19/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/19/2008
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 06/19/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/19/2008
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 06/19/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/19/2008
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 06/19/2008
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/19/2008
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/19/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/19/2008
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 06/19/2008
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 06/19/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 06/19/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/19/2008
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/19/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/19/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/19/2008
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/19/2008
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 06/19/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/19/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 06/19/2008
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/19/2008
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/20/2008
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 06/20/2008
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/20/2008
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/20/2008