Text: H.Res.954 — 110th Congress (2007-2008)

Bill text available as:

Shown Here:
Engrossed in House (02/12/2008)


Formatting necessary for an accurate reading of this legislative text may be shown by tags (e.g., <DELETED> or <BOLD>) or may be missing from this TXT display. For complete and accurate display of this text, see the PDF or HTML/XML.




[Congressional Bills 110th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[H. Res. 954 Engrossed in House (EH)]


                In the House of Representatives, U. S.,

                                                     February 12, 2008.
Whereas Luis Aguilar was born in El Paso, Texas, on November 26, 1976, to Luis 
        Aguilar and Cecilia G. Silva;
Whereas Luis Aguilar resided in Somerton, Arizona, and is survived by his mother 
        and father, his wife, Erica Aguilar, his two children, Luis and Arianna, 
        his brother, senior Border Patrol agent Marco Antonio Aguilar, and his 
        sister, Angie Aguilar;
Whereas Luis Aguilar joined the United States Border Patrol on July 21, 2002;
Whereas on January 19, 2008, after over 5 years of dedicated service in the 
        United States Border Patrol, Luis Aguilar selflessly paid the ultimate 
        sacrifice in service to the United States;
Whereas Border Patrol agents carry out the vital role of protecting our Nation's 
        borders and ensuring the safety of the United States;
Whereas Border Patrol agents work devotedly and selflessly on behalf of the 
        people of the United States, without regard for the peril or danger to 
        themselves; and
Whereas the United States will forever be grateful for the service of Luis 
        Aguilar and mourn his loss: Now, therefore, be it
    Resolved, That the House of Representatives--
            (1) recognizes the dedication and sacrifice made by the men and 
        women who have lost their lives while serving as United States Border 
        Patrol agents;
            (2) honors Luis Aguilar for his service as a Border Patrol agent and 
        for his sacrifice to the United States; and
            (3) extends its deepest condolences to the family of Luis Aguilar.
            Attest:

                                                                          Clerk.