Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 11/13/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 11/13/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 11/13/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 11/13/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 11/13/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/14/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 11/14/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 11/14/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 11/15/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 11/15/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 12/04/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 12/04/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 12/04/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 12/04/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 12/04/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 12/04/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 12/04/2007
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 12/04/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/04/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 12/05/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 12/05/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 12/05/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 12/10/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 12/10/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 12/10/2007