Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 11/06/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 11/06/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20]* 11/06/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 11/07/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 11/07/2007
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 11/07/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 11/07/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 11/07/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 11/07/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 11/07/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 11/07/2007
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 11/07/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 11/09/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 11/09/2007
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 11/09/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 11/09/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 11/09/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 11/15/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 11/15/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 11/15/2007
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 11/15/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 11/15/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 11/15/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 11/15/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 11/15/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 11/15/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 11/15/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 11/15/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 11/15/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 11/15/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 11/15/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 12/04/2007
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 12/05/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/30/2008