Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 10/31/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/31/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 10/31/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 10/31/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 10/31/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 10/31/2007
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 10/31/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/31/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 10/31/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/31/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 11/05/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 11/05/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 11/05/2007
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 11/05/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 11/05/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 11/05/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 11/05/2007
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 11/05/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 11/06/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 11/06/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 11/06/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 11/06/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 11/06/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 11/06/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 11/06/2007
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 11/06/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 11/06/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 11/06/2007
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 11/06/2007
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 11/06/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 11/06/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 11/06/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 11/06/2007
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 11/06/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 11/06/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 11/06/2007
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 11/06/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 11/06/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 11/06/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 11/06/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 11/06/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 11/06/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 11/06/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 11/06/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/06/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 11/06/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 11/06/2007
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 11/06/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 11/06/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 11/06/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 11/06/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 11/06/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 11/06/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 11/06/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 11/06/2007
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 11/06/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 11/06/2007
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 11/06/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 11/06/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 11/06/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 11/06/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 11/08/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 12/04/2007
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 12/04/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 12/04/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 12/04/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 12/04/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 12/19/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/26/2008