Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 10/15/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 10/15/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 10/15/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 10/15/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 10/15/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 10/15/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 10/15/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 10/15/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 10/15/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 10/15/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 10/15/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 10/15/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 10/15/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 10/15/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 10/15/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 10/15/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 10/15/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/16/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/16/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/16/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/16/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/16/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 10/16/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/18/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/18/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/18/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 10/18/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/18/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 10/18/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 10/18/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/18/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/18/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/22/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/22/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/22/2007
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 10/22/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/22/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/22/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 10/22/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/22/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/22/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/24/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 10/24/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/24/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/24/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/24/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/24/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 10/24/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/24/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/29/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/29/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/29/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/29/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/29/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 10/29/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 10/29/2007