Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 10/10/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 10/10/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 10/10/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 10/10/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 10/10/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 10/15/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 10/15/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/15/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/15/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 10/15/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/15/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/15/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 10/15/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 10/15/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 10/15/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 10/15/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/15/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/15/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 10/15/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 10/15/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 10/15/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/15/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/15/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/15/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 10/15/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 10/15/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/15/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 10/15/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 10/15/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 10/15/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/15/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 10/15/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/15/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/15/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 10/15/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 10/15/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/15/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/15/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/15/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/16/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 10/16/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 10/16/2007
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 10/16/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 10/16/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 10/16/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/16/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/17/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 10/17/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 10/17/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 10/17/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/17/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 10/17/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/17/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/22/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 10/22/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/22/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/22/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/22/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/22/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/22/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 10/22/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/22/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 10/23/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 10/23/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 10/23/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/23/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/29/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/29/2007