Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 09/18/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 09/18/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 09/18/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 09/18/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 09/18/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 09/18/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 09/18/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 09/18/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 09/18/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 09/18/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 09/24/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/24/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 09/24/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/03/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 10/03/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/03/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/05/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/12/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/12/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 10/17/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/17/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/17/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/17/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/17/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/17/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/17/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/17/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/17/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 10/17/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 10/17/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/17/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 10/17/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/17/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 10/17/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 10/17/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 10/17/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 10/17/2007
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 10/17/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 10/17/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 10/17/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/17/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/25/2007
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 11/15/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 11/15/2007