Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/18/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/18/2007
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 09/18/2007
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 09/18/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/18/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/18/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/19/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/19/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 09/19/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 09/19/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/19/2007
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 09/19/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/19/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/19/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/19/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 09/19/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/19/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 09/20/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/20/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 09/20/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 09/25/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/25/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/25/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 09/25/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 09/25/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/25/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/25/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/25/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 09/25/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/25/2007
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 09/25/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 09/25/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/26/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/26/2007