Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 10/17/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/17/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 10/17/2007
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 10/17/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 10/17/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 10/17/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 10/17/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 10/17/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 10/17/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/17/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 10/17/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 10/17/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 10/17/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 10/17/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 10/25/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 10/25/2007
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 10/25/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 10/25/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/25/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 11/07/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 11/07/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 11/07/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 11/07/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 11/07/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 11/07/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 11/07/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 11/07/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 11/07/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 11/07/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 11/07/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 11/07/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 12/11/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 12/11/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 12/11/2007
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 12/11/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 12/11/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 12/11/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 12/11/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 12/11/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 12/11/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 12/11/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 12/11/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 12/11/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 12/11/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 02/07/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/07/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/07/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/07/2008