Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 07/19/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 07/19/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 07/19/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/24/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/24/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/24/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 07/24/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 07/24/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/24/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/24/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/24/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/26/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/30/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/30/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/31/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/31/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/31/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 08/01/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 08/01/2007
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 08/03/2007
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 09/04/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 09/04/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 09/04/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/17/2007