Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 01/11/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 01/30/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 01/30/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 01/30/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/30/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/30/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/30/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 01/30/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/30/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 01/30/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 01/30/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/31/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 01/31/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 01/31/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/06/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/06/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/06/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/06/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/06/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 02/08/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/08/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 02/08/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/08/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 02/14/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/14/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/14/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/27/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/27/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/12/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/12/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/13/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/13/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/13/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/21/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/21/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/26/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/26/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/17/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/19/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/24/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/19/2008