Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 07/16/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 07/16/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 07/16/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 07/16/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/23/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/24/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/24/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/24/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 07/25/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/25/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/25/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 07/25/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/25/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/25/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 07/25/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/25/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/25/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/25/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 07/25/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 07/25/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/25/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/25/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/25/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/25/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/25/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/25/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 07/25/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/25/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/25/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/25/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 07/25/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/25/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/25/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/25/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/25/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/26/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/27/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/30/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/30/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/30/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 07/30/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/31/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/31/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 08/01/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 08/01/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 08/01/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 08/01/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 09/19/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/19/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 09/19/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/19/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 09/24/2007