Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 05/21/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/21/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/22/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/22/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/22/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/22/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/22/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/22/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/22/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 05/22/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/22/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/22/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 05/22/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/22/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/22/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/22/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 05/22/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/22/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/22/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/22/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/22/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/22/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/22/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/22/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/22/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 05/23/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/23/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/23/2007
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 05/23/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/23/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/23/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/23/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/23/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/23/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/23/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/23/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/23/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/23/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/23/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/23/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/23/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/24/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/24/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/24/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/24/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/24/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/24/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/24/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/24/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/24/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/24/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/24/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/24/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/24/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/24/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/05/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/05/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/05/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/05/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/05/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/05/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/05/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/05/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/05/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/05/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/05/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/05/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/05/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/05/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/05/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 06/05/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/05/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/05/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/05/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/05/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 06/05/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/05/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/05/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/05/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 06/05/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/05/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/05/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/05/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/05/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/05/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/05/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/05/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/05/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/05/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/05/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/05/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/05/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/05/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/05/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/05/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/05/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/05/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/05/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/05/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/05/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/05/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/05/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/05/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/05/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/05/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/05/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 06/05/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/05/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/05/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/05/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/05/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/05/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/05/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/05/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/05/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/05/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/05/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/05/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/05/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/05/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/05/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 06/05/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/05/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 06/05/2007