Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 05/17/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 05/17/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 05/17/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 05/17/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 05/17/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 05/17/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/21/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 05/21/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/22/2007
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/22/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 05/24/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 05/24/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 05/24/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/24/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 05/24/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/05/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/05/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 06/05/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/06/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 06/06/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 06/06/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/06/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/12/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/25/2007