Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8]* 04/20/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 04/20/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 04/20/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 04/20/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/25/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/25/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/25/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/25/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/25/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 04/25/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/25/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/25/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/25/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/25/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/25/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 04/25/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/25/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/25/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/25/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 04/25/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/01/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 05/01/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 05/17/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/17/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/28/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/28/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/28/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 06/28/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/28/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 07/11/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 07/11/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 07/11/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/11/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/11/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/11/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/11/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 07/11/2007