Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/13/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/13/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 02/16/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 02/16/2007
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 02/16/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 02/16/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 02/16/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 02/16/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 02/16/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 02/16/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 02/16/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 02/16/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/16/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/16/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 02/16/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 02/16/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/16/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 02/16/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 02/16/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/06/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/06/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/06/2007
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/06/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/06/2007
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 03/06/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/06/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/06/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/06/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/06/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 03/06/2007
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/12/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/12/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/19/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/26/2007
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 03/26/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/17/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 05/01/2007