Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/11/2008
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/11/2008
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/11/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/11/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 09/11/2008
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/11/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 09/11/2008
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/11/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/11/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/11/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/11/2008
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/11/2008
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/11/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 09/11/2008
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 09/11/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/11/2008
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 09/11/2008
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/11/2008
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/11/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/11/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/11/2008
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 09/11/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/11/2008
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/11/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/11/2008
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/15/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/15/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 09/15/2008
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 09/15/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/18/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 09/18/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/18/2008
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 09/22/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/22/2008
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/22/2008
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/22/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/22/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/22/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 09/22/2008
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 09/22/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/22/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 09/23/2008
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/25/2008
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 09/25/2008