Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/08/2008
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/08/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/08/2008
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 09/08/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 09/11/2008
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/11/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 09/11/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/11/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/11/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/16/2008
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 09/16/2008
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 09/18/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 09/18/2008
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 09/18/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/18/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 09/18/2008
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/18/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/18/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/18/2008
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/18/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/18/2008
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/18/2008
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 09/18/2008
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 09/18/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/18/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/18/2008
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 09/18/2008
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/18/2008
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/22/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/22/2008
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 09/22/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/22/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/22/2008
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 09/22/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/22/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/22/2008
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 09/22/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 09/22/2008
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/22/2008
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 09/22/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/22/2008
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/22/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/22/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/22/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/22/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/22/2008
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 09/22/2008
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/22/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/23/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/25/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 09/25/2008