Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 07/29/2008
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 07/29/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/29/2008
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 07/29/2008
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 07/29/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/15/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/15/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/15/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/15/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/15/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/15/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/15/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/15/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/15/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/15/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/15/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/16/2008
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 09/16/2008
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/16/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/16/2008
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 09/16/2008
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 09/16/2008
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/16/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/16/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/16/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/16/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/16/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 09/16/2008
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/16/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/16/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/16/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/16/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/16/2008
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/16/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/16/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/16/2008
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/16/2008
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/16/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/16/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/16/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/16/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 09/16/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/16/2008
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/16/2008
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/16/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/16/2008
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 09/16/2008
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/16/2008
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/16/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/16/2008
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/16/2008
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 09/16/2008
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/16/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 09/16/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/16/2008
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/16/2008
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/16/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/16/2008
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 09/16/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/16/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 09/16/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/17/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/17/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/17/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/17/2008
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 09/17/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/17/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/17/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/17/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/17/2008
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/17/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/17/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/17/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/17/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/17/2008
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/17/2008
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/17/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/17/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/17/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/17/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/17/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/17/2008
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 09/17/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/17/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/17/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/17/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/17/2008
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 09/17/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/17/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 09/17/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/17/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/17/2008
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/17/2008
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/17/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/17/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/17/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/17/2008
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 09/17/2008
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 09/17/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/17/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/17/2008
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/17/2008
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/17/2008
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 09/18/2008
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/18/2008
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 09/18/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/18/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/18/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/18/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/22/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/22/2008
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/22/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/22/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/22/2008