Text: H.Res.1352 — 110th Congress (2007-2008)

There is one version of the bill.

Bill text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/17/2008)


Formatting necessary for an accurate reading of this legislative text may be shown by tags (e.g., <DELETED> or <BOLD>) or may be missing from this TXT display. For complete and accurate display of this text, see the PDF or HTML/XML.




[Congressional Bills 110th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[H. Res. 1352 Introduced in House (IH)]







110th CONGRESS
  2d Session
H. RES. 1352

  Honoring Theodore Roosevelt, the 26th President, for his invaluable 
 contributions to this Nation as a soldier, naturalist, statesman, and 
         public servant on the 150th anniversary of his birth.


_______________________________________________________________________


                    IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

                             July 17, 2008

  Mr. King of New York submitted the following resolution; which was 
      referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform

_______________________________________________________________________

                               RESOLUTION


 
  Honoring Theodore Roosevelt, the 26th President, for his invaluable 
 contributions to this Nation as a soldier, naturalist, statesman, and 
         public servant on the 150th anniversary of his birth.

Whereas Theodore Roosevelt, one of America's greatest presidents, was born on 
        October 27, 1858, in New York City, New York;
Whereas at the young age of 23 years, Theodore Roosevelt was elected to the 
        first of 3 terms as a representative in the New York State Assembly, 
        which lasted from 1882 until 1884;
Whereas from 1895 until 1897, Theodore Roosevelt served as commissioner of the 
        New York City Police Department;
Whereas while serving as assistant secretary of the Navy under President William 
        McKinley from 1897 until 1898, Theodore Roosevelt organized the First 
        United States Volunteer Cavalry Regiment, popularly known as the ``Rough 
        Riders'', and then served as colonel of this regiment during the 
        Spanish-American War;
Whereas from 1898 until 1900, Theodore Roosevelt served as governor of New York;
Whereas in 1900, with the reelection of President McKinley, Theodore Roosevelt 
        was elected as the 25th Vice President;
Whereas upon becoming the 26th President the following year, Theodore Roosevelt 
        took an active role in foreign affairs, establishing the United States 
        as a new world power;
Whereas as President, Theodore Roosevelt instituted broad reforms at home, 
        particularly with respect to labor, monopolies, and conservation, 
        throughout the duration of his presidency;
Whereas Theodore Roosevelt instituted ``Big Stick'' diplomatic efforts by 
        increasing the size of the naval fleet to the second largest fleet in 
        the world by the end of his presidency;
Whereas Theodore Roosevelt made great strides in the regulation and oversight of 
        United States commerce, especially in the area of trusts and labor 
        relations, by signing the Department of Commerce and Labor Act of 1903 
        and the Elkins Act of 1903, which criminalized the railroad industry's 
        practice of extending rebates to valued customers;
Whereas Theodore Roosevelt addressed the growing corruption of trusts by 
        bringing lawsuits against 44 such entities during his presidency, 
        earning himself the nickname ``Trust Buster'';
Whereas Theodore Roosevelt was a dedicated conservationist, establishing 150 
        national forests, the first 51 Federal bird reservations, 5 national 
        parks, the first 18 national monuments, the first 4 national game 
        preserves, and the first 21 reclamation projects, which altogether 
        extended Federal protection to nearly 230,000,000 acres of land;
Whereas beginning in 1903, Theodore Roosevelt successfully negotiated a treaty 
        with the Government of Panama to create the Panama Canal and remained 
        active in the oversight of the construction from its beginning in 1904 
        until the end of his presidency;
Whereas in 1906, Theodore Roosevelt received the Nobel Peace Prize, the first 
        citizen of the United States to receive such prize, for leading the 
        efforts to end the Russo-Japanese War with a 1905 peace treaty;
Whereas in 1906, Theodore Roosevelt signed the Pure Food and Drug Act into law, 
        which established the Food and Drug Administration, and the Meat 
        Inspection Act, which regulated the meat-packing industry;
Whereas from 1886 until his death in 1919, Theodore Roosevelt made his home at 
        Sagamore Hill in Oyster Bay, New York, which, in addition to being the 
        home of Theodore Roosevelt and his family, from 1902 to 1908, served as 
        his ``Summer White House'';
Whereas on January 16, 2001, Theodore Roosevelt was posthumously awarded the 
        Congressional Medal of Honor for leading a charge up the San Juan 
        Heights in Cuba during the Spanish-American War shortly before the War 
        ended, thereby becoming the first President to be awarded the 
        Congressional Medal of Honor; and
Whereas October 27, 2008 will be the 150th anniversary of Theodore Roosevelt's 
        birth: Now, therefore, be it
    Resolved, That the House of Representatives--
            (1) honors Theodore Roosevelt, the 26th President of the 
        United States, for his invaluable contributions to this Nation 
        as a soldier, naturalist, statesman, and public servant on the 
        150th anniversary of his birth.
                                 <all>