Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 07/23/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/23/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/23/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/23/2008
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 07/24/2008
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/24/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 07/24/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/24/2008
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/24/2008
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/24/2008
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 07/24/2008
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 07/24/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 07/29/2008
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/29/2008
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 07/29/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 07/29/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/30/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/30/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/30/2008
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 07/31/2008
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 07/31/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/31/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/08/2008
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/08/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/08/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/11/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/11/2008
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/15/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/15/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/15/2008
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/15/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/15/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/15/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/17/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/17/2008
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 09/17/2008
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 09/17/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/17/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/17/2008
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/17/2008
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/17/2008
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/17/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/17/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 09/17/2008
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 09/17/2008
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 09/17/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 09/17/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/17/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 09/17/2008
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 09/17/2008
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/18/2008
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 09/18/2008
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/18/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/24/2008