Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/22/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/22/2008
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 07/22/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/22/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/22/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/22/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/22/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/22/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 07/22/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/22/2008
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 07/22/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/23/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/23/2008
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 07/23/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/23/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/23/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/23/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 07/23/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/23/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/23/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/23/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/23/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 07/23/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/23/2008
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/23/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/23/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/24/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/24/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/24/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/24/2008
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/29/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/29/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/30/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/30/2008