Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 07/08/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/09/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/09/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/09/2008
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/09/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/09/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/09/2008
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 07/09/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/09/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/09/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 07/09/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/09/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/10/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/14/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/14/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/14/2008
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/15/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/15/2008
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/15/2008
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 07/15/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/15/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/15/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/15/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/16/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/16/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/17/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/17/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/17/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/17/2008
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/17/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/22/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/22/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/22/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/22/2008
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 07/29/2008