Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/08/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 07/08/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/08/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/08/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/08/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/10/2008
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/10/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/10/2008
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 07/10/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/10/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/10/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/10/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/10/2008
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 07/10/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/10/2008
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/10/2008
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/10/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/10/2008
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/10/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/10/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/10/2008
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/10/2008
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/10/2008
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/10/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 07/10/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 07/10/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 07/10/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/10/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/10/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/14/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/14/2008
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/14/2008
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/14/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/14/2008
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/14/2008
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 07/14/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/15/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 07/15/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 07/17/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/22/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/23/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/23/2008
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/24/2008
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/29/2008
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/30/2008