Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/20/2008
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 06/20/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/20/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/20/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/20/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 06/20/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 06/20/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 06/20/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/20/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 06/20/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 06/20/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 06/20/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 06/20/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/25/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/25/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/25/2008
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/26/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/14/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/14/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/14/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/14/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/14/2008
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/14/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/14/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/14/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/14/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/14/2008
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/14/2008
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/14/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/14/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/14/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/14/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/14/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/14/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/14/2008
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 07/14/2008
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 07/14/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/15/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/15/2008
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 07/15/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/15/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/15/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/15/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/15/2008
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 07/15/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/15/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/15/2008
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/15/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/15/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/15/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/15/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/15/2008
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 07/15/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/15/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/15/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/15/2008
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 07/15/2008
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 07/15/2008
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/16/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/16/2008
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/16/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 07/16/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/16/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 07/16/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/16/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/24/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/31/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/31/2008