Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 06/05/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 06/05/2008
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 06/05/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 06/05/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 06/05/2008
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 06/05/2008
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 06/05/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 06/05/2008
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 06/05/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/05/2008
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 06/05/2008
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 06/05/2008
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 06/05/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 06/05/2008
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 06/05/2008
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 06/05/2008
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 06/05/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 06/05/2008
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 06/05/2008
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 06/05/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 06/05/2008
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 06/05/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 06/05/2008
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 06/05/2008
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 06/05/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 06/05/2008
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 06/05/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 06/05/2008
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 06/05/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 06/05/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 06/05/2008
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 06/05/2008
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 06/05/2008
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 06/05/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 06/05/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/10/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/11/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/11/2008
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 06/11/2008
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 06/11/2008
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/11/2008
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 06/11/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/11/2008
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 06/11/2008
Rep. Cazayoux, Donald J., Jr. [D-LA-6] 06/11/2008
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 06/11/2008
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 06/11/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/11/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 06/11/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/11/2008
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 06/18/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/19/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 06/19/2008
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 06/19/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 06/19/2008
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 06/19/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/25/2008
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 06/25/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 06/25/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/25/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/25/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 06/25/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 06/26/2008
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 06/26/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/26/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/26/2008
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 06/26/2008