Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/22/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/10/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/10/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 06/10/2008
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 06/10/2008
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/19/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/19/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/19/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 06/19/2008
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 06/19/2008
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 06/19/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/19/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/19/2008
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 06/19/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/19/2008
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 06/19/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/19/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/19/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/19/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/19/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/19/2008
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/19/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/19/2008
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 06/19/2008
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 06/19/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 06/19/2008
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/19/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/19/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 06/19/2008
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/19/2008
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 06/19/2008
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/19/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/19/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/19/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 06/19/2008
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/19/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/19/2008
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 06/19/2008
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 06/19/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 06/19/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/19/2008
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 06/19/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/19/2008
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 06/20/2008
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/20/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/20/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/20/2008
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 06/20/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/20/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/20/2008
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 06/20/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/23/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/23/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/23/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/23/2008