Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/20/2008
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/20/2008
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/20/2008
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 05/20/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/20/2008
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 05/20/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/03/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/04/2008
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/04/2008
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/04/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/04/2008
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/04/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/04/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 06/04/2008
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/04/2008
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 06/04/2008
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/05/2008
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 06/05/2008
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/05/2008
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 06/05/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/10/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 06/11/2008
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/11/2008
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/18/2008
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 06/18/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/18/2008
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/18/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/18/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/18/2008
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 06/18/2008
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/18/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/18/2008
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/18/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/18/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/23/2008
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 06/25/2008
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/08/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 07/08/2008
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/08/2008
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/08/2008
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/08/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 07/08/2008
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/08/2008
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 07/09/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/09/2008
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 07/09/2008
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/10/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 07/10/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 07/16/2008
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 07/16/2008
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/17/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 07/17/2008
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/21/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/21/2008
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/22/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 07/22/2008