Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/29/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/29/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/29/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/29/2008
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/06/2008
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/06/2008
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/06/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/06/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/06/2008
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 05/06/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/06/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/06/2008
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/06/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/06/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/06/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 05/07/2008
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/07/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/07/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/07/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/07/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/07/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/07/2008
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 05/07/2008
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 05/07/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/07/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/07/2008
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 05/07/2008
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 05/07/2008
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 05/07/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/07/2008
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/07/2008
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/07/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/07/2008
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 05/07/2008
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 05/07/2008
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/07/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/07/2008
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 05/07/2008
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/07/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/07/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/07/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/07/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/07/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/07/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/07/2008
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/07/2008
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/07/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/07/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/07/2008
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 05/07/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 05/07/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/07/2008
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 05/07/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/07/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/07/2008
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/08/2008
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 05/08/2008
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/08/2008
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/14/2008