Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 04/23/2008
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 04/23/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 04/23/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 04/23/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 04/23/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 04/23/2008
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 04/23/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 04/23/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 04/23/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/23/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 04/23/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 04/23/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 04/23/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/23/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 04/23/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 04/23/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/23/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 04/23/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 04/23/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 04/23/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/23/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 04/23/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 04/23/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 04/23/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/23/2008
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 04/23/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 04/23/2008
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/23/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 04/23/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 04/23/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/23/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/23/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 04/23/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 04/23/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/23/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 04/23/2008
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 04/23/2008
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 04/23/2008
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 04/23/2008
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/23/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 04/23/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/23/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 04/23/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/23/2008
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 04/23/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 04/23/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 04/23/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 04/23/2008
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 04/23/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 04/23/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/24/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/24/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/24/2008
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/24/2008
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/24/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/29/2008
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 04/29/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/29/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/29/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/29/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/29/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/29/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/29/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/29/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/29/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/29/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/29/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 04/29/2008
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 04/29/2008
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/29/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/29/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 04/29/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/29/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 04/29/2008
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/29/2008
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 04/29/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/29/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/29/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/29/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/29/2008
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/29/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/30/2008
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 04/30/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/30/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/30/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/30/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/30/2008
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/30/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/30/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 04/30/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/30/2008
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/30/2008
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 04/30/2008
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/30/2008
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/30/2008
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 04/30/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/30/2008
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/30/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/30/2008
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 04/30/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/30/2008
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 04/30/2008
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/30/2008
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 04/30/2008
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/30/2008
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 04/30/2008
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/30/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/30/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/30/2008
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 04/30/2008
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 04/30/2008
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/30/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 04/30/2008
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/30/2008
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 04/30/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/30/2008
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 04/30/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/30/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/30/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/05/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/05/2008
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/05/2008
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 05/05/2008
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/05/2008
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/05/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 05/05/2008
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/08/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/08/2008
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 05/08/2008
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/08/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/08/2008
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 05/08/2008
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/08/2008
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/08/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 05/08/2008
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/08/2008
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 05/08/2008
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/08/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 05/08/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 05/08/2008
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/08/2008
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/08/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/08/2008
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/08/2008
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 05/08/2008
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 05/08/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/08/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/13/2008