Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 04/23/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/23/2008
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/23/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/23/2008
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 04/23/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/23/2008
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/23/2008
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 04/23/2008
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 04/23/2008
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/23/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 04/23/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/23/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 04/23/2008
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/24/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/24/2008
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 04/24/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/24/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/24/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 04/24/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/24/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/24/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/24/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/24/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/24/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/24/2008
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/24/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/24/2008
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/24/2008
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/24/2008
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/24/2008
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 04/24/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 04/24/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 04/29/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/29/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/29/2008
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 04/29/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/29/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 04/29/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/29/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/29/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/29/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 04/29/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/29/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/29/2008
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 04/29/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 04/29/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/29/2008
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 04/29/2008
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 04/29/2008
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 04/29/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/29/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/29/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/29/2008
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/29/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 04/29/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/29/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 04/29/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/29/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 04/29/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/29/2008
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 04/29/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/29/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/30/2008
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 05/01/2008
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/05/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/05/2008
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/07/2008
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 05/08/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/13/2008