Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 04/08/2008
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 04/08/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/08/2008
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 04/08/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 04/08/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 04/08/2008
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 04/08/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 04/08/2008
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 04/08/2008
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 04/08/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 04/08/2008
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 04/08/2008
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 04/08/2008
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/10/2008
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 04/10/2008
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/10/2008
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 04/10/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/10/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 04/10/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 04/10/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/10/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/10/2008
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 04/10/2008
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 04/10/2008
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 04/10/2008
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/10/2008
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 04/10/2008
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 04/10/2008
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 04/10/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 04/10/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 04/10/2008
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 04/10/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 04/10/2008
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/10/2008
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 04/10/2008
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/10/2008
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/10/2008
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 04/10/2008
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/10/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 04/10/2008
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 04/10/2008
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/10/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/10/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/10/2008
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/10/2008
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 04/10/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 04/10/2008
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 04/10/2008
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 04/10/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/10/2008
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 04/10/2008
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/10/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 04/10/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/10/2008
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 04/10/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/10/2008
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 04/10/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/10/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/10/2008
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 04/10/2008
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 04/10/2008
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/10/2008
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/10/2008
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 04/10/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/10/2008
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/10/2008
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 04/10/2008
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/10/2008
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 04/10/2008
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 04/10/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/10/2008
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 04/10/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/10/2008
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/10/2008
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 04/10/2008
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/10/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/10/2008
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/10/2008
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/10/2008
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 04/10/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 04/10/2008
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/10/2008
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/10/2008
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 04/10/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 04/10/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 04/10/2008
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 04/10/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 04/10/2008
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 04/10/2008
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/10/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 04/10/2008
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 04/14/2008
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 04/14/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/14/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/14/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/14/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/14/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/14/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/14/2008
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 04/14/2008
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/14/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/14/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/14/2008
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/14/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/14/2008
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 04/15/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 04/15/2008
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/22/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 04/22/2008
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/29/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/29/2008
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 04/29/2008