Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 04/01/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/01/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/01/2008
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 04/01/2008
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 04/01/2008
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 04/01/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 04/01/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 04/01/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 04/01/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 04/01/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 04/01/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 04/01/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 04/01/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 04/01/2008
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 04/01/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 04/01/2008
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 04/01/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 04/01/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 04/01/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 04/01/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/17/2008
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 04/17/2008
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/23/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/01/2008
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 05/06/2008
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 05/06/2008
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 05/21/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/22/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/22/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 05/22/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/22/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/22/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/22/2008