Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 03/12/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/14/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/06/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 05/13/2008
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 05/13/2008
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 05/20/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/20/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/20/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/22/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/03/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/03/2008
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/03/2008
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/08/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 07/10/2008
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 07/10/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/10/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 07/10/2008
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 07/10/2008
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/10/2008
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 07/10/2008
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 07/15/2008
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 07/15/2008
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/15/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/15/2008
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/15/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 07/15/2008
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/15/2008
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/17/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 07/17/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/17/2008
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 07/17/2008
Rep. Cazayoux, Donald J., Jr. [D-LA-6] 07/17/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/22/2008
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 07/22/2008
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/22/2008
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 07/22/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/23/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/31/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/31/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 08/01/2008
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 08/01/2008
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/08/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/08/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/08/2008
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 09/08/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/08/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 09/09/2008
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 09/09/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/09/2008
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/09/2008
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 09/09/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/09/2008
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 09/09/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/09/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/09/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/11/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 09/11/2008
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 09/11/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/11/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/11/2008
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 09/15/2008
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 09/15/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/15/2008
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 09/15/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 09/15/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/15/2008
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 09/15/2008
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 09/15/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 09/15/2008
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 09/16/2008
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/16/2008
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/16/2008
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/16/2008
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 09/16/2008
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 09/16/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/16/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/16/2008
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 09/16/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 09/16/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/16/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 09/16/2008
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/16/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/16/2008
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/16/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 09/16/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/16/2008
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 09/16/2008
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 09/16/2008
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 09/16/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 09/16/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 09/16/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/16/2008
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/16/2008
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 09/16/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/17/2008
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 09/17/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/17/2008
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/17/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/17/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/17/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 09/17/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 09/18/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/18/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/18/2008
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 09/18/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/18/2008