Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 03/10/2008
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/11/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/11/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/11/2008
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/11/2008
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 03/11/2008
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 03/12/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/12/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/12/2008
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/13/2008
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 03/13/2008
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/13/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/31/2008
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/31/2008
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/01/2008
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 04/02/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/02/2008
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 04/02/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 04/02/2008
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/02/2008
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 04/02/2008
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/02/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/02/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 04/02/2008
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 04/02/2008
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 04/02/2008
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 04/02/2008
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/02/2008
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/02/2008
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 04/02/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 04/02/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/02/2008
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 04/02/2008
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 04/02/2008
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 04/02/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/02/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 04/02/2008
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 04/02/2008
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 04/02/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/02/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/02/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/02/2008
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/02/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/02/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/02/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/02/2008
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/02/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/02/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/02/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/02/2008
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/02/2008
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/02/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/02/2008
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/02/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/02/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/08/2008
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 04/08/2008
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/08/2008
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 04/08/2008
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 04/09/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/10/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/14/2008
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 04/14/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 04/16/2008
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 04/24/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/24/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/30/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/30/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/05/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/05/2008
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/06/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/07/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/07/2008
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/13/2008
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 05/13/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/13/2008
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 05/19/2008