Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/28/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/04/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/04/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/11/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/11/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/11/2008
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/11/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/11/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/11/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/11/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/11/2008
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/11/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/11/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/11/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/11/2008
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/11/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/11/2008
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/13/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/13/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/13/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/13/2008
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/13/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/13/2008
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/14/2008
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/14/2008
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 04/01/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/01/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/01/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/01/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/01/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/01/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/01/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/02/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/02/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/02/2008
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/02/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/03/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/03/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/03/2008
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 04/03/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/03/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 04/09/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/09/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/09/2008
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/09/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/09/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/10/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/10/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/10/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/15/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/15/2008
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 04/16/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/16/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/23/2008
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/24/2008
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/29/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/29/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/30/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/01/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/05/2008