Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 05/22/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 05/22/2008
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/03/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/03/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/03/2008
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/03/2008
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 06/05/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/05/2008
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/05/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/05/2008
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 06/05/2008
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 06/05/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/09/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/09/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/09/2008
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/09/2008
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/09/2008
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/09/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/09/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/10/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 06/10/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 06/10/2008
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 06/10/2008
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 06/10/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/10/2008
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/10/2008
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/10/2008
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/10/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/11/2008
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/11/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 06/11/2008
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/11/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/11/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/11/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 06/11/2008
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/11/2008
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/12/2008
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 06/12/2008
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 06/12/2008
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 06/12/2008
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 06/18/2008
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/18/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/18/2008
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/18/2008
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/18/2008
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/18/2008
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/18/2008
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 06/18/2008
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/18/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/18/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 06/18/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/18/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/18/2008
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/19/2008
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/20/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/23/2008
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 06/24/2008
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 06/25/2008
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 06/26/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 06/26/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/16/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/16/2008
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 07/16/2008
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 07/31/2008
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 09/09/2008