Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/09/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 03/09/2007
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 03/09/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/09/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/12/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 03/21/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 03/26/2007
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/27/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 04/16/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/16/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 04/16/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/16/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 04/16/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/16/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/17/2007
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 04/19/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/20/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 04/20/2007
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 04/30/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/03/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/09/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/23/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/23/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/24/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 05/24/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/24/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/24/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/24/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/05/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/05/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/05/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/06/2007
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 06/06/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/07/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/11/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/11/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 06/11/2007
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/11/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 06/11/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 06/11/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 06/11/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/11/2007
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 06/13/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/13/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/25/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 06/25/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 06/25/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 09/14/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/14/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/18/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/19/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/24/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 10/04/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 12/04/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 01/17/2008
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/13/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 02/21/2008
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 02/21/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 02/26/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/05/2008
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 04/02/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/03/2008
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 04/04/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 04/09/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/09/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 04/14/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/24/2008
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/12/2008
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/12/2008
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 07/14/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/10/2008
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 09/24/2008