Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/28/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/28/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/05/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/05/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/09/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/12/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/12/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/19/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/19/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/21/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/26/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/16/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/16/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/16/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/16/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 04/20/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/24/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/30/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/30/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/01/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/01/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/15/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/22/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/23/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/24/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/24/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/05/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/05/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/05/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/07/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/07/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 06/07/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/07/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/07/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/07/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/07/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/12/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/12/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/12/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/12/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 06/13/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/13/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/13/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 06/19/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/20/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/25/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/16/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/16/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/16/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/16/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/16/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/18/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 08/01/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/05/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/18/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/03/2008
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 03/04/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/04/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/04/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/06/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/13/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/03/2008