Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 09/16/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 09/16/2008
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 09/16/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 09/16/2008
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 09/16/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 09/16/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 09/16/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 09/16/2008
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 09/16/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 09/17/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 09/17/2008
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/17/2008
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/17/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/17/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/17/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/17/2008
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 09/17/2008
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 09/17/2008
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/17/2008
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 09/17/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 09/17/2008
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 09/17/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 09/18/2008
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 09/18/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/18/2008
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 09/18/2008
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 09/18/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 09/18/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/23/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 09/23/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 09/23/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/25/2008
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/26/2008